NJ A1091 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2130

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.227.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Division of Travel and Tourism to advertise and promote tours of breweries in the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Division of Travel and Tourism to advertise and promote tours of breweries in the State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2056 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-24AssemblyApproved P.L.2021, c.227.
2021-06-03AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2021-06-03AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2021-06-03SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2021-06-03SenateSubstituted for S2056 (1R)
2021-03-22SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-11-19SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2020-11-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2020-10-29AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2020-10-08AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2130 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S2056 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A1091 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback