NH SJR1 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Chapter 0200
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Chapter 0200
Summary
Urging the secretary of agriculture to review the Federal Milk Market Order system.
Title
Urging the secretary of agriculture to review the Federal Milk Market Order system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Chapter 0200 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #1809 Adopted | |
2010-04-28 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #1809 Adopted; House Journal 36, PG.1732 | |
2010-04-28 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG.1713 | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 28 (Vote 11-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1595 | |
2010-04-13 | House Executive Session: 4/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2010-03-31 | House Public Hearing: 4/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 18, PG.1018 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 6, Pg.78 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.77 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 2/10/10; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Hearing: February 2, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Wildlife, Fish and Game and Agriculture; Senate Journal 1, Pg.9 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2879&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |