NH SCR1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1711
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1711
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special use permits in the White Mountain National Forest.
Title
Relative to special use permits in the White Mountain National Forest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - REMOVE FROM TABLE (REP SHURTLEFF) (Y: 259 N: 81 NV: 40 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1711 |
2013-06-26 | House | Floor Amendment #1554h(NT) (Rep Cushing): Amendment Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1709-1711 |
2013-06-26 | House | Suspend House Rules to Allow Present Action After Deadline (Rep Cushing): Motion Adopted Division Vote 256-78 By Required Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1709 |
2013-06-26 | House | Remove From Table (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 259-81; House Journal 52, PG.1707-1709 |
2013-05-08 | House | Lay Senate Calendar R1 on the Table (Rep John Hunt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 163-154; House Journal 41, PG.1412 |
2013-05-08 | House | Floor Amendment #2013-1554h(NT) (Rep Cushing); House Journal 41, PG.1410-1412 |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1203 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 35, PG.1192 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Woodburn Moved to Remove Senate Calendar R 1 from the Consent Calendar |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Hearing: 3/13/13, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |