NH SB96 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 07/02/2011; Chapter 0123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 07/02/2011; Chapter 0123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to amending the charter of The Pinkerton Academy.
Title
Relative to amending the charter of The Pinkerton Academy.
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Dowling [R] | Rep. Beverly Ferrante [R] | Rep. Kenneth Gould [R] | Rep. Phyllis Katsakiores [R] |
Sen. James Rausch [R] | Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 07/02/2011; Chapter 0123 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 19, Pg.396 | |
2011-05-25 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.1609 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1534 | |
2011-05-04 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 18 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1320 | |
2011-04-27 | House Executive Session: 5/3/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205-207 | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/28/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 19, Pg.439 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 6, Pg.61 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 5, Pg.54 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Hearing: 2/8/2011, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education, Senate Journal 3, Pg.35 |