NH SB94 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state certification of community residences in municipalities with zoning ordinances which accommodate certified community residences.
Title
Relative to state certification of community residences in municipalities with zoning ordinances which accommodate certified community residences.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.67 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.92 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Hearing: 2/8/2011, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs, Senate Journal 3, Pg.35 |