NH SB77 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1830
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1830
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a special purpose village district within the town of Danbury.
Title
Authorizing the creation of a special purpose village district within the town of Danbury.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1830 |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jun 3 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1630-1631 |
2015-04-28 | House | Executive Session: 5/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-04-15 | House | ==CANCELLED==Executive Session: 4/23/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-31 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 4/16/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing: 4/14/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0739s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0739s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0739s, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Hearing:=== TIME CHANGE === 1/28/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 12:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |