NH SB761 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to accountability of the community college system of New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to accountability of the community college system of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1190s Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5 |