NH SB759 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employers provision of reasonable accommodations for pregnant employees.
Title
Relative to employers provision of reasonable accommodations for pregnant employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1061s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1061s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Morse Moved to Remove SB 759 from the Consent Calendar; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1061s, 03/11/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 103, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |