NH SB742 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of Alzheimer's Disease and related disorders and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to the definition of Alzheimer's Disease and related disorders and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. Megan Murray [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] | Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1128s Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0310s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0310s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0310s, 02/06/2020; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 04:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |