NH SB740 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of health care facility under the state board of fire control.
Title
Relative to the definition of health care facility under the state board of fire control.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. Fred Doucette [R] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/13/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |