NH SB691 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prior authorization for prescription drug coverage.
Title
Relative to prior authorization for prescription drug coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. Greg Indruk [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2 |