NH SB64 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extending unpaid leave benefits to employees for COVID-19 purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending unpaid leave benefits to employees for COVID-19 purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenatePending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
2021-02-11SenateSen. French Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
2021-02-01SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/11/2021; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-27SenateRemote Hearing: 02/01/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback