NH SB60 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-10 - Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0239; Effective 08/08/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-10 - Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0239; Effective 08/08/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to water quality.
Title
Relative to water quality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0239; Effective 08/08/2023 |
2023-07-28 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2252e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-07-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2252e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 17 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-08 | House | Amendment # 2023-1840h: Amendment Failed Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 56 |
2023-06-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1635h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 59 |
2023-06-08 | House | Amendment # 2023-1635h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 55 |
2023-05-16 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. Hynes, T. Mannion, Read, Granger, Hoell, Phillips, Wheeler, D. Kelley, McCarter, Cushman) 05/16/2023 House Journal 15 P. 3 |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1635h 05/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 05/03/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-04-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/19/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0880s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0880s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0880s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |