NH SB596 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of disability or special needs under the child care scholarship program.
Title
Relative to the definition of disability or special needs under the child care scholarship program.
Sponsors
Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2024-04-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/22/2024 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2024-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/22/2024 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 04/22/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-12 | House | Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1468s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1468s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2024; Senate Journal 9 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1468s, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 14A |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1408s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Ricciardi Floor Amendment # 2024-1408s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Ricciardi Moved Ought to Pass; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Lang Moved to Remove SB 596 from the Consent Calendar; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 3 |