NH SB54 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB54
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the absentee ballot application form.
Title
Relative to the absentee ballot application form.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Wayne MacDonald [R] |
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 06/16/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-01-10 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study SB54 11/15/2021 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 9 |
2021-11-12 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-05-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Executive Session: 05/19/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99392215410 |
2021-04-29 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/05/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/98783397971 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 03/31/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95912119642 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0422s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0422s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0422s, 03/04/2021; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/25/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB54 (Carry Over) 2021-05-20 - Retained in Committee