NH SB54 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the absentee ballot application form.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the absentee ballot application form.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0422s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0422s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseRetained in Committee
2021-05-12HouseExecutive Session: 05/19/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99392215410
2021-04-29HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/05/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/98783397971 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-25HousePublic Hearing: 03/31/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95912119642 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 48
2021-03-04SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0422s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0422s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-02-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0422s, 03/04/2021; Senate Calendar 12
2021-01-21SenateRemote Hearing: 01/25/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=925&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB54
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=916&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=916
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=82&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0054&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB54&ddlsponsors=&lsr=925
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=83&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0054&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB54&ddlsponsors=&lsr=925
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=82&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0054&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB54&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0925
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=83&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0054&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB54&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0925

Bill Comments 750

feedback