NH SB537 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 201-148 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 201-148 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to record management of abuse and neglect reports.
Title
Relative to record management of abuse and neglect reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - OTP (Y: 169 N: 179 NV: 18 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 201-148 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 41 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 169-179 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 39 |
2016-05-11 | House | FLAM #2016-1899h (Rep. Itse): Amendment Failed DV 163-181 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 38 |
2016-04-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 29 P. 16 |
2016-04-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 11-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 16 |
2016-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0859s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0859s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/10/2016 Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0859s, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 03/01/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |