NH SB526 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a public school facility condition assessment and school building aid grants for temperature control.
Title
Relative to a public school facility condition assessment and school building aid grants for temperature control.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Brian Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 10 |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/10/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 8 |
2024-04-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/26/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 6 P. 139 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0683s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0683s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0683s, 02/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |