NH SB523 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring public school students to receive training in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator device.
Title
Requiring public school students to receive training in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator device.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 2 |