NH SB522 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-05 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing an early childhood education scholarship account and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to establishing an early childhood education scholarship account and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Matthew Coker [D] |
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2024, Vote 4-2; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0966s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0966s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-0966s, 03/21/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |