NH SB513 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vehicle repair standards.
Title
Relative to vehicle repair standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Kermit Williams [D] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |