NH SB496 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Special Order to the Beginning of Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a per and polyfluoroalkyl substances fund and programs and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a per and polyfluoroalkyl substances fund and programs and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateSpecial Order to the Beginning of Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-13SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0458s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-13SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-0458s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0458s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6
2020-01-16SenateHearing: 01/21/2020, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback