NH SB458 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - III. Remainder Effective 06/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - III. Remainder Effective 06/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reporting by political committees and relative to agreements to share voter information with other states.
Title
Relative to reporting by political committees and relative to agreements to share voter information with other states.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 06/26/2016 |
2016-06-21 | Senate | II. Sections 2-3 Effective 07/01/2017 |
2016-06-21 | Senate | I. Section 1 Effective 01/01/2017 |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2016; Chapter 0270 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-08 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2115e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2115e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 57 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with House Amendments # 1854h, New Title and #1858h, New Title, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1854h and 1858h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 125 |
2016-05-11 | House | FLAM #2016-1858h (NT) (Rep. Schroadter): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 125 |
2016-05-11 | House | FLAM #2016-1854h (NT) (Rep. Hoelzel): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 124 |
2016-05-11 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoelzel) 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 8 |
2016-04-12 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-30 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0636s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2016-0636s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Ought to Pass; 02/18/2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Special Order SB 458-FN to to the end of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECONVENE=== 01/27/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 01/20/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |