NH SB450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - II. Remainder Effective 10/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - II. Remainder Effective 10/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an advisory commission for the department of environmental services relative to the delegation of authority of the National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System Program.
Title
Establishing an advisory commission for the department of environmental services relative to the delegation of authority of the National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 10/01/2019 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 03/01/2020 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0320 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2085e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2085e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1809h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | FLAM # 2018-1809h (Rep. Kurk): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Special Order to 5/2/2018 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Kurk) 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/17/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/10/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Finance 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1205h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 6 |
2018-04-05 | House | Amendment # 2018-1205h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 6 |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1205h for 04/05/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6 |
2018-03-29 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1072s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1072s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1072s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0393s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0393s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0393s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |