NH SB439 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibiting discriminatory boycotts of Israel in state procurement and investments.
Title
To prohibiting discriminatory boycotts of Israel in state procurement and investments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-04-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/23/2024 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) |
2024-04-15 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 6 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2024, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |