NH SB438 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the repeal of truth in sentencing.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the repeal of truth in sentencing.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Beth Rodd [D] |
Rep. David Welch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/18/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:25 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |