NH SB429 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0249; Effective 06/10/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0249; Effective 06/10/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changing statutory references from the "Workforce Investment Act" to the "Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act" and relative to the provision of aggregate statistical reports to certain workforce training programs.
Title
Changing statutory references from the "Workforce Investment Act" to the "Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act" and relative to the provision of aggregate statistical reports to certain workforce training programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0249; Effective 06/10/2016 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 58 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved to Concur with House Amendment # 1897h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Infantine): Motion Failed DV 112-173 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 109 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1897h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 109 |
2016-05-11 | House | FLAM #2016-1897h (Rep. Infantine): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 108 |
2016-05-11 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Failed DV 139-145 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 107 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation for 05/11/2016 (Vote 9-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 26 |
2016-04-27 | House | Executive Session: 05/03/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-04-27 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/03/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 01/27/2016 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 10 P. 10 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/21/2016; Senate Journal 3 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/21/2016; Senate Calendar 2 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Hearing: 01/14/2016, Room 103, State House, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |