NH SB4 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a scholarship program for New Hampshire residents to attend any New Hampshire public postsecondary education institution.
Title
Establishing a scholarship program for New Hampshire residents to attend any New Hampshire public postsecondary education institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1084s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration of Vote on SB 4, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1084s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1084s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1084s, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/5/13, Room 103, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5 |