NH SB390 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0049; Effective 07/02/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0049; Effective 07/02/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the procedure in retirement system hearings concerning qualification for disability retirement benefits.
Title
Relative to the procedure in retirement system hearings concerning qualification for disability retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0049; Effective 07/02/2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/21/2016); Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 51 |
2016-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 7 |
2016-03-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/06/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 8 |
2016-03-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/17/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 01/27/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 10 P. 10 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/21/2016; Senate Journal 3 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/21/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 2 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |