NH SB355 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Conferee Change: Rep. Bershtein Replaces Rep Spilsbury 05/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Conferee Change: Rep. Bershtein Replaces Rep Spilsbury 05/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring online marketplaces to disclose certain information to consumers.
Title
Requiring online marketplaces to disclose certain information to consumers.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] |
Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Bershtein Replaces Rep Spilsbury 05/17/2022 |
2022-05-04 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 176-155 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-28 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/28/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/13/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0654s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0654s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0654s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |