NH SB342 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0313; Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0313; Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring identification of specific items in the default budget.
Title
Requiring identification of specific items in the default budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment 1014s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment 1014s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0313; Effective 08/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2023c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2023c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2023c Filed 05/16/2018; As Amended by the House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Birdsell Replaces Senator Woodburn; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 02:00 pm, Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Matthews, F. McCarthy, Tripp, Migliore 05/10/2018 House Journal 8 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Gray, Daniels, Woodburn; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1452h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 26 |
2018-04-19 | House | Amendment # 2018-1452h: Amendment Adopted DV 199-138 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 26 |
2018-04-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1446h |
2018-04-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1452h for 04/19/2018 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 13 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2018 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/10/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1009s, and 2018-1014s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2018-1014s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1009s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1009s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:40 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |