NH SB330 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - III. Remainder Effective 06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - III. Remainder Effective 06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study and make recommendations relative to the office of professional licensure and certification and the licensure of professions under boards, councils, and commissions within the office and relative to the expiration of terms of the board of foresters members.
Title
Establishing a committee to study and make recommendations relative to the office of professional licensure and certification and the licensure of professions under boards, councils, and commissions within the office and relative to the expiration of terms of the board of foresters members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 06/17/2022 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | II. Section 5 Effective 01/01/2028 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | I. Section 4 Effective 01/01/2023 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0219 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2096e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2096-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1863h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | FLAM # 1863h (Rep. Abrami): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1732h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1732h (NT) (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2022-1424h: 04/19/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0822s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0822s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0822s, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-15 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |