NH SB316 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0217; Effective 08/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0217; Effective 08/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to lucky 7 licenses.
Title
Relative to lucky 7 licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0217; Effective 08/16/2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-06 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Abrami) 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1889h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | FLAM # 1889h (Rep. Abrami): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/12/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Ways and Means |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-0174s and 2022-0371s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Sen. Rosenwald Floor Amendment # 2022-0371s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0174s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0174s, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |