NH SB315 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0098; Effective 07/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0098; Effective 07/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definitions of beverage and of mead.
Title
Relative to the definitions of beverage and of mead.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0098; Effective 07/24/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1496e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1496e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 29 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 4 |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 3 |
2018-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/28/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/27/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0283s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0283s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0283s, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |