NH SB305 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-03 - Conference Committee Report Not Accepted by House pursuant to House Rule 49(j) 05/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-03 - Conference Committee Report Not Accepted by House pursuant to House Rule 49(j) 05/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the brew pub license.
Title
Relative to the brew pub license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Conference Committee Report Not Accepted by House pursuant to House Rule 49(j) 05/19/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-2102c Filed 05/26/2016; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2016-05-25 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Williams Replaces Rep. Abel 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 30 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/26/2016, 11:00 am, Room 100, State House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/24/2016, 03:30 pm, Room 100, State House==RECESSED== |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/23/2016, 03:00 pm, Room 100, State House==RECESSED== |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Feltes Replaces Senator Pierce |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Biggie, Abel, Hurt 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 16 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 16 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Prescott, Bradley, Pierce; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1916h, New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; 05/19/2016 Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1916h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 123 |
2016-05-11 | House | FLAM #2016-1916h (Rep. Hunt): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 123 |
2016-05-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 123 |
2016-05-11 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hunt) 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/11/2016 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 6 |
2016-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-04-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2016-03-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/07/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-16 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |