NH SB300 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state commission for human rights.
Title
Relative to the state commission for human rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Susan Homola [R] |
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8A |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |