NH SB293 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to clarify the intent of RSA 644:9 relative to violation of privacy.
Title
Establishing a committee to clarify the intent of RSA 644:9 relative to violation of privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1348h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 1348h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1348h (Vote 16-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 6 |
2022-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/06/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0665s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0665s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0665s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |