NH SB291 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 179-143 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 179-143 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the issue of unmarried cohabitants, domestic partnerships, and common law marriage.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the issue of unmarried cohabitants, domestic partnerships, and common law marriage.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Jim Maggiore [D] |
Rep. Kate Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 179-143 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 12 |
2022-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/06/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |