NH SB253 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0244; Effective 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0244; Effective 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to grounds for termination of parental rights.
Title
Relative to grounds for termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0244; Effective 01/01/2015 |
2014-06-17 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1990c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1990c, Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-30 | House | Conference Committee Report #2014-1990c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2014, 1:30 p.m., Room 103, State House |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014, 10:00 a.m., Room 103, State House |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Walz, Long, Rollo, Gargasz |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to accede to request for C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Lasky, Carson, and Soucy |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1165h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-04-30 | House | Reconsideration Third Reading (Rep. Lambert) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202 |
2014-04-30 | House | Third Reading Motion Adopted Div, 184-155 |
2014-04-30 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1165h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment #2014-1165h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1165h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32 |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-03-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0713s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0713s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0713s, 3/6/14; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/14, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |