NH SB246 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 183-146 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 183-146 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to qualified private communities.
Title
Relative to qualified private communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 183-146 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0700s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0700s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0700s, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |