NH SB244 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exemption of income from taxation under the tax on interest and dividends.
Title
Relative to exemption of income from taxation under the tax on interest and dividends.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 244-FN- to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 244-FN-A to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0811s, Regular Calendar 13Y-8N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0811s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0811s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/08/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |