NH SB243 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting transfer on death deeds for real property.
Title
Permitting transfer on death deeds for real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Public Hearing: 04/13/2022 10:30 am State House Reps Hall |
2022-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1102s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1102s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1102s, 03/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |