NH SB239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2019; Chapter 0122; Effective 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2019; Chapter 0122; Effective 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to implementation of the blue alert system in New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to implementation of the blue alert system in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2019; Chapter 0122; Effective 08/20/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 4 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Special Order to the Present Time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |