NH SB231 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0046 Effective 05/18/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0046 Effective 05/18/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the month of inspection for municipal fleets.
Title
Relative to the month of inspection for municipal fleets.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Franklin Sterling [R] | Rep. Virginia Irwin [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2015; Chapter 0046 Effective 05/18/2015 |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/07/2015); Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1778 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1580 |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 29 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1484 |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 4/21/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 11:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0182s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0182s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0182s, 2/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/3/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |