NH SB23 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0144; Effective 06/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0144; Effective 06/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing certain advanced practice registered nurses to authorize involuntary commitment and voluntary admission to state institutions.
Title
Allowing certain advanced practice registered nurses to authorize involuntary commitment and voluntary admission to state institutions.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Joanne Ward [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0144; Effective 06/12/2015 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Concurs with House Amendment #1123h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1123h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1539-1540 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1123h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1539-1540 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1123h for Apr 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1304 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-25 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 4/2/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/5/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |