NH SB216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0204; Effective 07/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0204; Effective 07/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to differential pay for state troopers and relative to crowd control by marine patrol officers.
Title
Relative to differential pay for state troopers and relative to crowd control by marine patrol officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0204; Effective 07/05/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1997h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 132 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1997h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 132 |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1997h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 25-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 15 |
2017-05-17 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 05/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-05-17 | House | Division II Work Session: 05/23/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-05-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-05-04 | House | Division II Work Session: 05/10/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-04-19 | House | Division II Work Session: 04/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Finance House Journal 11 P. 28 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 216-FN to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 216-FN to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Special Order SB 216-FN to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Special Order SB 216-FN to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5 |