NH SB206 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0215; Effective 01/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0215; Effective 01/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to wagering on simulcast racing.
Title
Relative to wagering on simulcast racing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0215; Effective 01/01/2018 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 25 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2215e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2215e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 10 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 23 |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/01/2017 (Vote 20-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 10 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-05-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-19 | House | Public Hearing: 04/26/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 11 P. 28 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1230s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. French Floor Amendment #2017-1230s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. French Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 206-FN to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 206-FN to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0806s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0806s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0806s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/15/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |