NH SB206 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making a capital appropriation for a facility in Milford for a circuit court and a division of motor vehicles office.
Title
Making a capital appropriation for a facility in Milford for a circuit court and a division of motor vehicles office.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Jack Flanagan [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] |
Rep. Frank Edelblut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/19/15, Room 103, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Capital Budget; Senate Journal 4 |