NH SB20 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2013; Chapter 0219; Effective 07/11/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2013; Chapter 0219; Effective 07/11/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making modifications to the DWI ignition interlock program.
Title
Making modifications to the DWI ignition interlock program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2013; Chapter 0219; Effective 07/11/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2042e Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2042e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Rausch Moved Concur with House Amendment 1508h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1508h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-76; House Journal 45, PG.1517-1520 |
2013-05-29 | House | Amendment #1508h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1517-1518 |
2013-05-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar40, PG.1373 |
2013-05-16 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-1508h; House Calendar40, PG.1382 |
2013-05-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1508h for May 29 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar40, PG.1373 |
2013-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 5/14/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-04-08 | House | Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0128s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0128s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0128s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 2:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |