NH SB198 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to review of job candidate applications by school board members.
Title
Relative to review of job candidate applications by school board members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |